Trustees EDMONTON BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1128147

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Ann Watkins | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Geohagen | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Dunkley | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neil Amaning-Ampong | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Hamlin | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ampofo-Anti | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Barker | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adetutu Towolawi | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
HELENA KIAFUCA | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Keisha-Marie BARNETT | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
William Clark | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sabrina Ramsay | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.