THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER WOOLTON

Charity Number: 1132014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Anglican Church

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £260,759
Total expenditure: £263,122

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Liverpool City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 October 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST PETER'S PCC WOOLTON (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr GEORGE KURUVILLA Trustee 24 April 2023
WOOLTON COMMUNITY LIFE
Received: On time
ST. THOMAS INDIAN (MALANKARA) ORTHODOX CHURCH
Received: On time
Susan Whitaker Trustee 24 April 2023
None on record
Dr Rebecca Vinter Trustee 24 April 2023
None on record
Nicola Hazledine Trustee 24 April 2023
None on record
Bethan Dulley Trustee 24 April 2023
None on record
Sandra Paisley Trustee 28 April 2022
None on record
Rachel Louise Farmer Trustee 28 April 2022
None on record
Jane Griffiths Trustee 28 April 2022
SALISBURY HOUSE
Received: 152 days late
WARRINGTON TRAINING COLLEGE INCORPORATED (ST KATHARINES COLLEGE)
Received: On time
Thomas William Canty Trustee 28 April 2022
None on record
Norma Marion Winsland Trustee 28 April 2022
None on record
Michael John Welsby Trustee 28 April 2022
None on record
Stephen Nicholas Butler Trustee 11 January 2022
None on record
Roger Whitaker Trustee 09 February 2021
None on record
Ian McColl Trustee 02 April 2019
None on record
Susan West Trustee 24 March 2016
ST JAMES PRE-SCHOOL WOOLTON
Received: On time
Christopher David Lee Trustee 28 April 2013
None on record
DOROTHY MAY BAKER Trustee 04 December 2012
None on record
Dr Susan Valerie Craig Trustee 29 April 2012
None on record
ALISTAIR FLETCHER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £284.09k £304.17k £348.11k £416.37k £260.76k
Total expenditure £314.34k £266.80k £219.86k £248.05k £263.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 19 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 19 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Simon Peter Centre
Church Road
Woolton
LIVERPOOL
L25 5JF
Phone:
01514286810