Financial history BAILDON METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1128664
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £191.93k £235.16k £303.99k £685.13k £281.04k
Total expenditure £333.53k £199.29k £257.86k £487.39k £237.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £20.87k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.80k N/A £12.00k £18.72k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £608.03k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £66.29k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £10.81k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £347.00k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £487.39k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A