Financial history GREEN STREET GREEN BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1128822
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £190.45k £137.99k £149.96k £150.43k £173.80k
Total expenditure £358.28k £134.09k £126.93k £167.66k £142.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A