PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARYS THEYDON BOIS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Parochial Church Council of St Marys Church is responsible for the upkeep and running of our parish church, vicarage and church hall. Three services are held on a Sunday and one midweek. There is a programme of instruction for children between 3 and 15 years old. Comfort and support is administered to the needy and the sick by clergy and members of the church where necessary.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 31 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST MARY THE VIRGIN THEYDON BOIS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gemma Louise Groves | Trustee | 31 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Helen Elizabeth Fox | Trustee | 31 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew John Crook | Trustee | 31 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
William James Bennett | Trustee | 31 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Kerry Ells | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
John Philip | Trustee | 31 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Sam Spencer | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Liz Douglass | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Rosalyn Judith Philip | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|||||||
Hugh Meteyard | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|||||||
Andrew Tunks | Trustee |
|
||||||||
diana meteyard | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MARY ELIZABETH GILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ELIZABETH HANNIBAL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
BARBARA ROBYN MARSH BA DIP ED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Elizabeth DEBENHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £156.08k | £99.06k | £128.30k | £153.07k | £141.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £130.37k | £113.82k | £117.10k | £144.36k | £123.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 AVENUE ROAD
THEYDON BOIS
EPPING
CM16 7JJ
- Phone:
- 01992812188
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window