SHEFFIELD JAZZ

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sheffield Jazz' objects are to promote, maintain, improve and advance education for the public benefit by encouraging and fostering understanding, knowledge, appreciation and development of music, the arts, and in particular jazz, by running concerts and putting on workshops. Sheffield Jazz is run on an entirely voluntary basis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Barnsley
- Derbyshire
- Doncaster
- Nottinghamshire
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 03 August 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr TAMORA DAVINA JAMES | Trustee | 15 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Perryman | Trustee | 11 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roy Saxby | Trustee | 14 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY MATTHEWS | Trustee | 07 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.45k | £5.39k | £44.98k | £58.05k | £60.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.77k | £5.19k | £46.30k | £58.38k | £58.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 DECEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ENCOURAGING AND FOSTERING UNDERSTANDING, KNOWLEDGE, APPRECIATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF MUSIC AND THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR, JAZZ.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Circle
33 Rockingham Lane
SHEFFIELD
S1 4FW
- Phone:
- 0114 253 6600
- Email:
- admin@sheffieldjazz.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window