Financial history WEST KIRBY UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY

Charity number: 1128869
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £95.44k £100.18k £134.82k £145.66k £151.05k
Total expenditure £159.91k £153.03k £185.24k £180.41k £194.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A