Financial history THE ASHOVER LIGHT RAILWAY SOCIETY

Charity number: 1129958
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £9.54k £29.51k £8.61k £13.32k £3.20k
Total expenditure £17.01k £12.78k £16.66k £13.58k £11.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A