Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH SOUTH MIMMS

Charity number: 1129436
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £335.80k £339.97k £415.81k £521.32k £428.26k
Total expenditure £299.14k £350.73k £338.51k £382.03k £460.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £13.45k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £512.75k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £2.06k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £6.51k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £130.16k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £382.03k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A