Accounts and annual returns ISLINGTON COMMUNITY THEATRE

Charity number: 1130953
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2017 21 December 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 December 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2016 21 June 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 June 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2015 27 June 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 June 2016 On Time