Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY COGGES

Charity number: 1129824
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sonia Duraturo Trustee 11 May 2025
THE METHODIST CHURCH, WEST OXFORDSHIRE CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Nigel Cotton Trustee 11 May 2025
None on record
Rev Matthew Beer Trustee 17 November 2024
BLAKE EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
Jonathon Mark Jeffes Trustee 17 March 2024
None on record
Christopher Rimmer Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Darin Paul Stevens Trustee 20 June 2023
None on record
Edward Lyle Trustee 20 June 2023
None on record
Katrina McKenzie Trustee 16 April 2023
None on record
Jonathan Hodson Trustee 16 April 2023
None on record
Deena Mary McGuire Trustee 16 April 2023
None on record
Suzanne Day Trustee 16 April 2023
CROSSLIGHT ADVICE
Received: On time
Rev Andrew Reid Trustee 08 September 2022
None on record
Allen Gordon Moxham Trustee 17 March 2022
None on record
Andrew Marshall Trustee 25 November 2020
None on record
Olivia Jane Watterson Trustee 15 October 2020
None on record
Rosemarie Pocock Trustee 15 October 2020
None on record
Nicola Marie Nash Trustee 15 October 2020
None on record
Ian William Hilary Smith Trustee 21 March 2019
None on record
Andrew David Newham Trustee 21 March 2019
GOOD NEWS FOR EVERYONE!
Received: On time
KEITH HARWOOD Trustee
BLAKE EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time