WEST ORCHARD UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing regular worship for all. Promoting and teaching the Christian faith. Serving the community. Giving pastoral care and support to members and others in need, particularly those in sickness, distress or poverty. Providing premises and resources for community groups and activities. Providing activities, training, nurture and support for children and young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Coventry City
Governance
- 10 June 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Matthews | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret O'Kane | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Mary Barnes | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE LUCKETT | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Sarah Jarrad | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mary Goodwin | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev Yvonne Stone | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET KERR COSTIGAN | Trustee | 15 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA DAWSON | Trustee | 16 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.28k | £81.68k | £77.72k | £105.38k | £134.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £202.70k | £126.74k | £139.31k | £197.80k | £268.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.06k | £1.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUSTS DISTILLED FROM THE UNITED REFORM CHURCH ACTS OF PARLIAMENT (1972 AND 1982) AND THE SCHEME OF UNION (1972)
Charitable objects
The object of the Charity is the advancement of the Christian faith for the benefit of the public in accordance with the Scheme of Union of the United Reformed Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
West Orchard URC
Baginton Road
Coventry
CV3 6FP
- Phone:
- 02476419927
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window