Trustees PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, PRIMROSE HILL WITH ST PAUL, AVENUE RD

Charity number: 1132701

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip Simon James Ritchie Chair 30 November 2023
None on record
Lucinda Ferelith Smith Trustee 28 April 2024
THE THREE SQUIRRELS TRUST
Received: On time
Anny-Aleida Van Woudenberg Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Madeleine Mary du Vivier Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Jessica Ann Davidson Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Ellen Campbell Gilmour Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Alexandra Margaret Jane Carter Trustee 25 April 2021
CAMDEN CHOIR
Received: On time
John Hellinikakis Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Ross Stephan Gilmour Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
Roderick William James Monroe Trustee 24 April 2016
None on record
TED RUSCOE Trustee 18 October 2011
None on record
ELAINE ROSE GRACE HEDGER Trustee
None on record
AMANDA MARTIN Trustee
None on record