Trustees SOUTH WALES POLICE YOUTH TRUST
Charity number: 1133057

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADRIAN PAUL OLIVER LL.B. | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sharon Iquo Dixon | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Janet Davies | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Diana Sara Stroia | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Maal | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Clare Wools | Trustee | 03 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard John Penry Lewis MBE DL | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janey Elizabeth Howell | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Melanie James | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Rosaleen Moriarty-Simmonds OBE | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tina Donnelly | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Vaughan | Trustee | 25 April 2001 |
|
|
||||
ANNE YVETTE MORGAN JP DL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.