Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW, KIRK ELLA IN THE DIOCESE OF YORK

Charity Number: 1130514
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £185.67k £199.57k £253.42k £207.42k £227.42k
Total expenditure £193.29k £198.99k £230.33k £251.81k £257.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £6.94k £8.34k