Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST GEORGE THE MARTYR, DEAL, KENT
Charity number: 1130487

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Christopher Graham Spencer | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Gillian Adele Chiverton | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Burr | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kaitelyn Chappell | Trustee | 16 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
LYNNE WILLIAMS | Trustee | 16 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Julie Gill | Trustee | 16 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Wakeman | Trustee | 16 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Page | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Julie Watson | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Robert Smith | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Robyn Langford | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR RONALD LONGMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DESMOND IAN BIRCHALL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.