Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SOUTHBOURNE WITH WEST THORNEY

Charity Number: 1130876
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £150.02k £215.93k £205.81k £182.93k £177.27k
Total expenditure £159.59k £191.79k £210.62k £220.82k £187.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £5.00k N/A N/A