Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, ELWORTH

Charity number: 1130803
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £211.83k £190.65k £155.46k £197.94k £174.12k
Total expenditure £234.87k £203.22k £209.95k £238.04k £246.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £3.60k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £240 £261 £261 N/A N/A