Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, ELWORTH
Charity number: 1130803

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Jane Hills | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Edmonds | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Clee | Trustee | 14 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ann TAYLOR | Trustee | 14 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Nicole Simone Archer | Trustee | 14 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Christine Wisbey | Trustee | 14 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Heather Savvides | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Catherine Mary Cooper | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Anthony Paul Rigby | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Richard Parfitt | Trustee | 12 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Jane Coppenhall | Trustee | 27 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Cargill | Trustee | 27 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
PAUL DIMITRI SAVVIDES | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
HELEN JONES | Trustee | 28 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE LESLEY WALKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK CHARLES BARKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR BILL CHAPMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS KATH CLIFFE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.