FRIENDS OF BENTON PARK PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1131264
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We fundraise to provide goods and services to support the school and advance the education of the pupils. We put on social events for parents and pupils to help build the school community. We help the school develop links with the local community. We encourage parents to become involved in their children's education, communicate with parents and represent parents.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Newcastle Upon Tyne City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 August 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Pamela Atzori Chair 02 December 2022
None on record
Dominic Martin Trustee 02 December 2022
OUSEBURN LEARNING TRUST
Received: On time
Claire Scott Trustee 02 December 2022
None on record
Matthew Cassady Trustee 02 December 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.37k £2.60k £307 £0 £0
Total expenditure £4.65k £2.47k £537 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £750 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 06 February 2025 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 22 November 2024 296 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 April 2023 83 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 February 2022 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 February 2021 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BENTON PARK PRIMARY SCHOOL
CORCHESTER WALK
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE7 7SS
Phone:
01912665122
Website:

No information available