Trustees ST MICHAELS WITHOUT

Charity number: 1130721
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Roger John Driver Chair 24 April 2016
MAYOR OF BATH'S RELIEF FUND
Received: On time
RICHARD HOLDEN Trustee 29 April 2024
CHURCH HALL
Received: On time
David Snook Trustee 29 April 2024
None on record
Ruth Holden Trustee 29 April 2024
None on record
Simon Jon Winchcombe Trustee 24 June 2023
None on record
Susan Claire Snell Trustee 05 June 2023
None on record
Alistair James Haggerty Trustee 26 May 2022
None on record
Charles Valentine Betts Trustee 26 May 2022
None on record
Jane Pleace Trustee 27 April 2021
The Zena Launchpad
Received: On time
Charles Dods Trustee 13 October 2020
None on record
Rachel Walker Trustee 29 April 2019
None on record
STEPHEN JOSEPH EGAN Trustee 23 May 2012
None on record
ANDREW TAPSFIELD Trustee 10 June 2011
None on record
SHEILA JANE WATTERS Trustee
None on record