Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW, BURGESS HILL (DIOCESE OF CHICHESTER)

Charity number: 1131284
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £231.23k £210.99k £231.08k £347.94k £569.60k
Total expenditure £208.47k £214.24k £189.27k £221.76k £351.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £475.12k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £53.56k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.55k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £11.44k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £18.93k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £14.48k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £272.73k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.10k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £33.52k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £79.16k