Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW, BURGESS HILL (DIOCESE OF CHICHESTER)

Charity Number: 1131284
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev William Kemp Chair 22 May 2024
THE POINT CHURCH
Received: On time
HURSTPIERPOINT COLLEGE LIMITED
Received: On time
BEFRIENDED
Received: On time
HOPE HOUSE HAITI (UK)
Received: On time
Rev Gareth Harper Trustee 11 May 2025
None on record
Philip Kelly Trustee 11 May 2025
CMC : PENSARN HARBOUR
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, ARDINGLY
Received: On time
James Allen Trustee 22 May 2024
HOPE BUILDING CONFIDENCE LTD
Received: On time
Jean Cooke Trustee 22 May 2024
THE POINT CHURCH
Received: On time
Margaret Kay Trustee 22 May 2024
None on record
Andrew Gillbard Trustee 22 May 2024
None on record
Dale Marklew Trustee 22 May 2024
THE POINT CHURCH
Received: On time
Sheila Smith Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Andrew Sherlock Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Mandy Anstee Trustee 27 September 2020
None on record
Amanda Hanlon Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Ian Porter Trustee 30 April 2018
None on record
Susan Gumbrell Trustee
None on record