THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BISHOP'S STORTFORD (ST MICHAEL)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ENABLE AS MANY PEOPLE AS POSSIBLE TO WORSHIP AT ST MICHAEL'S CHURCH AND TO BECOME PART OF THE PARISH COMMUNITY. WE TRY TO ENABLE PEOPLE TO LIVE OUT THEIR FAITH AS PART OF A COMMUNITY WORSHIPPING ACCORDING TO THE RITES AND PRACTICES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £72,441 from 7 government grant(s)
People

17 Trustee(s)
145 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 21 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST MICHAEL'S PCC (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Derwyn Gavin Williams | Chair | 20 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jack Brear | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Thomson | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Benjamin Adeyemi | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Hellis | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mireille Baulcomb | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gailie Anderson | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Graseman | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Weeks | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Oludotun Akinde | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Conquest | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Michelle Durnell | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gill Johnson | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM DAVID MACDONALD | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Peter Derrick Rixson | Trustee | 16 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Elizabeth Fox | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
REV June Elizabeth Knight | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £247.84k | £247.67k | £205.31k | £305.94k | £316.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £251.15k | £251.15k | £200.49k | £505.77k | £328.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £585 | £585 | £1.72k | £86.06k | £72.44k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Michaels Church
Windhill
BISHOP'S STORTFORD
CM23 2ND
- Phone:
- 01279461657
- Website:
-
WINDHILLBISHOPSSTORTFORD.HERTSCM232EY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window