Accounts and annual returns PIPE VILLAGE TRUST

Charity Number: 1134697
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2018 06 January 2020 160 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 06 July 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required