THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CUTHBERT, RYE PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church of England (Anglican) Church serving the people of Rye Park Parish.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £633 from 2 government grant(s)
People

19 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 30 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
- RYE PARK PCC (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katherine Hunt | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Dant | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Baker | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heidi Hopkins-Wase | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Falconbridge | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marlies Davies | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Billing | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Shaw | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ilona Crowder | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rowena Smith | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tamara Sharman | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Stickley | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Doree | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fran Murray | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA DANT | Trustee | 14 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 31 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID LEE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN JOHN BRENT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOROTHY NELLIE AYRE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.21k | £88.80k | £95.86k | £122.33k | £84.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.22k | £84.91k | £86.37k | £158.26k | £88.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £633 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Cuthberts Church
Whitley Road
HODDESDON
EN11 0PU
- Phone:
- 01992 466690
- Email:
- churchoffice@ryepark.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window