Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF KNARESBOROUGH, GOLDSBOROUGH, NIDD AND BREARTON

Charity number: 1134252
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £210.71k £343.50k £317.04k £487.44k £603.17k
Total expenditure £249.71k £276.36k £288.48k £351.58k £330.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £536.00k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £67.16k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £15.48k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £322.50k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £8.20k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £18.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0