Trustees Parochial Church Council of the ecclesiastical parish of St Wilfrid, Calverley, Leeds
Charity number: 1130921

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Rob Denton | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Faith Pollard | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kim Pollard | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Simkins | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Olivia GAUNT | Trustee | 30 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Lacey | Trustee | 30 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Williams | Trustee | 30 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jean Kelly Lightfoot | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kimberley Raja | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Edward Jobes | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Pickard | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Hainsworth | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Cohen | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Janice Tempest | Trustee | 21 May 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.