Financial history NOTTINGHAM STUDIOS LTD

Charity number: 1132064
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £250.44k £596.16k £564.63k £381.11k £358.01k
Total expenditure £242.84k £218.54k £267.38k £312.64k £379.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.50k £99.29k £36.00k N/A £2.88k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £46.25k £111.92k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £549.91k £452.71k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £218.54k £267.38k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £5.53k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A