THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS' BRENCHLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This is a church congregation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
90 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 03 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
- BRENCHLEY PCC (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR ROBERT AKENHEAD | Chair | 25 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew John Cameron | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Jean Lowe | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Charles Norman | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Derek Smithson | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Charles Edler | Trustee | 13 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Karen Maier | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robin Graham Brooks | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter William Richard WESTLEY | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Thelma Olive Cunningham | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Angela Jane Boobbyer | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS GAVIN WOODCOCK | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WILLIAM PHILIP GARTHWAITE | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
SARAH JANE THORPE | Trustee | 06 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
DIANA CLARE BROOKS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHERIE SANDRA SARGENT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £143.27k | £148.31k | £120.37k | £136.94k | £126.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £148.43k | £113.73k | £135.51k | £134.86k | £148.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.21k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Vicarage
8 Broad Oak
Brenchley
Tonbridge
- Phone:
- 01892722140
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window