Financial history EAST BARNET BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1130758
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £174.79k £142.38k £140.34k £130.34k £244.04k
Total expenditure £160.38k £132.80k £142.86k £134.05k £142.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A