THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF NEW WINDSOR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all Provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation Pastoral work, incl visiting the sick and bereaved Promoting the whole mission of the Church through the activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers and other special needs groups Supporting a project to provide for the locally homeless Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 10 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
- NEW WINDSOR PCC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev SALLY NICOLE LODGE | Chair | 06 June 2019 |
|
|||||||
Anne Elizabeth Casson | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
John Peter Halsey MA, MBA | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Richard Matthew Terrado-Reardon | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Jon Hunt | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Margaret Anne Pettitt | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Ian Stuart Patrick Mawhinney | Trustee | 19 May 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Kathryn Teresa Kerr | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|||||||
Mary Delaney | Trustee | 17 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Kate McQillian | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Robin Francis John McConnell | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
KAREN ALLOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MRS ESTLYN DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MICHAEL ROBERT YORK HARDING | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £168.10k | £126.55k | £124.24k | £147.57k | £165.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.71k | £178.41k | £224.25k | £151.95k | £240.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 March 2022 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 March 2022 | 134 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 November 2020 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 November 2020 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
All Saints Church
Frances Road
Windsor
Berkshire
SL4 1HU
- Phone:
- 01753 862419
- Email:
- windsor.rector@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window