Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS LONDON FIELDS WITH ST PAUL'S HAGGERSTON

Charity Number: 1130974
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £76.34k £106.52k £82.47k £113.41k £113.37k
Total expenditure £103.15k £65.94k £78.72k £79.92k £105.44k
Income from government contracts £50 £425 £425 £459 £1.02k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.13k