THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BROUGHTON ASTLEY AND CROFT WITH STONEY STANTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. Prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including to the sick and bereaved. Teaching of Christianity Religious assemblies in schools. Promoting the whole mission of the Church Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 25 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- PCC OF ST MARY & ST MICHAEL BROUGHTON ASTLEY AND CROFT WITH STONEY STANTON (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Peter Wootton | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Jordan | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Colin Bernard Atkinson | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Pauline Dahlia Cummins | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAUL Lawrence | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Mary Smith | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paula Anne Atkinson | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Reginald Davis | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|||||
BARBARA JANE BEDFORD | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Steve Windram | Trustee | 24 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARGIE BRIMACOMBE | Trustee | 16 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN BASS | Trustee | 02 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
LESTER PHILIP HALLING MA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER GEORGE YATES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHEILA MELANIE YATES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.81k | £134.06k | £148.97k | £114.42k | £112.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £108.57k | £143.92k | £157.26k | £104.27k | £92.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Main Street
Frolesworth
LUTTERWORTH
Leicestershire
LE17 5EG
- Phone:
- 01455272091
- Email:
- pccsec@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window