Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST MARY & ST CUTHBERT PARISH CHURCH, CHESTER-LE-STREET
Charity Number: 1130847

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Matthew David Strand | Chair | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Will Edward Hoy | Trustee | 06 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Janice Rowland | Trustee | 06 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul William Vincent | Trustee | 06 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Ann Pritchard | Trustee | 06 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Norma Ann Hedley | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Southern | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
June Austin | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Orr | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Miriam Wakefield | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kathryn Brown | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brian Armstrong | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Peter Hall | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Begg | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abbie Lauren Winter | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Appleby | Trustee | 04 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Dodds | Trustee | 04 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Kiernan Rayner | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Kenneth Austin | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alexander John Nelson | Trustee | 21 April 2015 |
|
|||||
Dorothy Crichton Hall | Trustee | 21 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
EDNA MAY SANDERSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.