Financial history TREKSTOCK LIMITED

Charity number: 1132421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £425.94k £430.05k £421.81k £521.76k £441.09k
Total expenditure £441.54k £424.03k £474.05k £462.14k £530.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £36.69k £2.19k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £521.76k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £6 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £283.20k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £178.94k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £2.40k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A