Financial history RAF HONINGTON SERGEANTS' MESS

Charity number: 1131113
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £122.34k £34.96k £106.03k £95.85k £104.96k
Total expenditure £117.09k £30.19k £110.87k £93.12k £106.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A