THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHANDLER'S FORD

Charity number: 1131152
Charity reporting is up to date (74 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Regular public worship open to all Provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation Pastoral work incl visiting the sick and bereaved Teaching Christianity Taking religious assemblies in schools Provision of Christian activities for all ages Promoting of Christianity through events and meetings and the whole mission of the Church Supporting charities in the UK and overseas.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £328,595
Total expenditure: £320,665

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
  • 13 March 2023: Funds received from 1191665 CHANDLER'S FORD HELP
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • CHANDLER'S FORD PCC (Working name)
  • THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF CHANDLER'S FORD (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

24 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Duncan Peter Lee Hollands Trustee 10 September 2024
None on record
Heather Blake Trustee 24 April 2024
None on record
Ewen Greenlees Trustee 24 May 2023
None on record
Deborah Pearce Trustee 24 May 2023
None on record
Susan Janet Marsland Trustee 24 May 2023
None on record
Pete Hale Trustee 28 March 2023
None on record
Jane Keen Trustee 28 March 2023
None on record
Michael Cooke Trustee 28 March 2023
None on record
Peter Knight Trustee 28 March 2023
None on record
Fiona Benham Trustee 27 April 2022
None on record
Hazel Bateman Trustee 27 April 2022
None on record
Sandra Luz Mendoza Groves Trustee 27 April 2022
None on record
Stuart Divall Trustee 20 April 2021
None on record
Barbara Dobson Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Paul Anfield Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Anne Elizabeth Davies Trustee 10 April 2019
None on record
Carole Hodgeson Trustee 01 April 2019
None on record
Carole Hodgson Trustee 25 April 2018
None on record
LYNNE CHRISTINE MURSELL Trustee 05 September 2011
None on record
ANNE ADDISS Trustee 05 September 2011
None on record
GLORIA JEANNE BROWN Trustee
None on record
LINDA ELIZABETH READ Trustee
AGE CONCERN-CHANDLER'S FORD
Received: On time
CHRISTINE SARAH CLARK Trustee
None on record
JEAN ALICE NOLAN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £319.55k £285.67k £310.23k £316.03k £328.60k
Total expenditure £325.76k £301.49k £298.84k £314.90k £320.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £2.74k N/A £2.35k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 13 January 2025 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 13 January 2025 74 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 08 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 08 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 14 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 12 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE PARISH OFFICE
St. Boniface Church
Hursley Road
Chandler's Ford
EASTLEIGH
SO53 2FT
Phone:
023 8026 5977