Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LEEDS ST GEORGE
Charity Number: 1131798

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
26 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susheel Das | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alex Joiner | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Laura Etukudoh | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Walker | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Jennings | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ian warner | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kin Man Suen | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nick White | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abigal Connor | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Whitman | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Collins | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Rev Joshua Lees | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Clare Oldfield | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Livesey | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ken Garner | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chinedu Okafo | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Barber | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Rachel Jones | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charmaine Kambabazi | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard McIntyre | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dianne Riley | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Swallow | Trustee | 03 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Rev Eve Rebecca Ridgeway | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev Elizabeth Louise Woolf | Trustee | 11 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Kibble | Trustee | 28 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP SYKES | Trustee | 06 June 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.