CITIZENS ADVICE CRAVEN AND HARROGATE DISTRICTS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide an information, advice and advocacy service to ensure that individuals do not suffer through lack of knowledge of their rights and responsibilities or through an inability to express their needs effectively. We also exercise a responsible influence on the development of social policies and services, both locally and nationally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Total income includes £171,942 from 2 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 03 August 2009: Standard registration
- 12 May 2015: Funds received from 1113157 RIPON AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
- 17 August 2015: Funds received from 1086686 CRAVEN CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
- 29 December 2022: Funds transferred to 1146084 North Yorkshire Citizens Advice & Law Centre Limit...
- 29 December 2022: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- HARROGATE CAB (Working name)
- CRAVEN AND HARROGATE DISTRICTS CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU (Previous name)
- HARROGATE CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £373.98k | £342.96k | £377.18k | £364.51k | £415.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £413.67k | £394.35k | £396.77k | £419.84k | £342.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £290.14k | N/A | £108.00k | £171.94k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £195.78k | £70.00k | N/A | £171.94k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 10 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 10 December 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/06/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 26/09/2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13 FEB 2018
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN HARROGATE AND DISTRICT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window