Trustees CPRE Rutland and Lincolnshire
Charity Number: 500480

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Giles Clifton | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Jane Burkitt | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabeth Reba Meek | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Arthur Clyde | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Simpson BEM | Trustee | 25 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Carolyn Jennifer Cartwright | Trustee | 12 April 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.