Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE GOOD SHEPHERD, ASHTON-UNDER-LYNE
Charity number: 1134826

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Dr Paul Malcolm Spenser Monk | Chair | 21 November 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Margaret Mary Dunn | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Ruth Summers | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Jamie Collins | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Peter Summers | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Carole Margaret Hulse | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Michael John Winterbottom | Trustee | 03 May 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Margaret Stanley | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Mrs C Farnsworth | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Janet Kennerley | Trustee | 20 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||
Tina Anne Howarth | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||
MAUREEN ANNE LEIGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
SANDRA JANE KIY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
JEFFREY GLENNON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
CATHERINE SHELDON MAAT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
PHILIP SYLVAN BOWDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
John Leslie Smith | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
JUDITH ANNE HILTON | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
Rev PATRICIA LODGE | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.