Accounts and annual returns THE INDEE ROSE TRUST

Charity Number: 1132471
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 16 July 2024 14 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 16 July 2024 14 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 16 July 2023 16 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 16 July 2023 16 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 16 July 2022 16 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 16 July 2022 16 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 16 July 2021 12 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 16 July 2021 12 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 16 July 2020 11 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 16 July 2020 11 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window