Financial history THE INDEE ROSE TRUST

Charity Number: 1132471
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 16/07/2020 16/07/2021 16/07/2022 16/07/2023 16/07/2024
Total gross income £158.68k £124.77k £188.55k £139.76k £82.02k
Total expenditure £109.56k £136.04k £98.24k £113.27k £71.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A