Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. PETER HENLEAZE
Charity number: 1131226

Charity reporting is up to date (34 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV CANON MARK PILGRIM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Christopher John Richard Tothill | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Quinn | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mathilde Spall | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lindsey Margaret Traub | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clare Fussell | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Rev Kandis Fiona Douglas | Trustee | 05 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mike Leddra | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jane Katherine Crawford | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALISTAIR ROBINSON | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Erik Dirdal | Trustee | 22 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
EMMA LOUISE BOLTON | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN FENNA BSC FIA | Trustee | 23 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Anne Kathryn Kilgour | Trustee | 23 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
SARAH HELEN THORNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARAH JANE THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WENDY JANE YOUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Ian Bradley LOVE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.