Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF EAST DEAN ST SIMON & ST JUDE WITH FRISTON ST MARY THE VIRGIN

Charity number: 1131638
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £89.07k £101.85k £108.66k £403.17k £117.75k
Total expenditure £94.74k £94.80k £105.64k £117.54k £124.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A