ALDERSHOT, FARNBOROUGH & CAMBERLEY METHODIST CIRCUIT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Circuit is an umbrella and resourcing body for the 11 local Methodist churches in this Circuit, helping them to effectively fulfil their mission statements to engage with all those who seek God or a spiritual dimension to their lives. We organise, provide leadership of and administer the governing body of the Circuit, employ the ministers and other workers, and encourage ecumenical work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bracknell Forest
- Hampshire
- Surrey
Governance
- 10 December 2009: Previously excepted registration
- 17 April 2013: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 17 April 2013: Funds transferred to 1137593 THE HANTS-SURREY BORDER METHODIST CIRCUIT
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £290.76k | £289.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £266.77k | £332.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | 19 December 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | 09 June 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | 21 January 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 09 February 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | 12 January 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND THE METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window