THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY MAGDALENE, PADDINGTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. Provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick & bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons & small groups. Taking of religious assemblies in schools. Promoting the whole mission of the Church through provision of activities for senior citizens, parents & toddlers and other special need groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 18 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST MARY MAGDALENE PCC, PADDINGTON (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Natasha Caroline Woodward | Chair | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Marcus Barcham Stevens | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
VIRGINIA ASHTON | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Carolyn Barker-Mill | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|||||||
NICHOLAS PAUL KAYE | Trustee | 23 July 2013 |
|
|||||||
MRS LESLEY CHAKRAVORTY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
NICKY CHAKRAVORTY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.84m | £307.60k | £315.30k | £355.08k | £25.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.60m | £365.86k | £655.05k | £345.82k | £19.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £419.00k | £28.84k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.83m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £7.68k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £925 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.56m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £33.69k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.58k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £5.58k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
147a SHIRLAND ROAD
LONDON
W9 2EP
- Phone:
- 07772677336
- Email:
- frhenry@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window