Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WEST KIRBY

Charity number: 1131379
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £184.71k £209.52k £215.98k £228.09k £269.56k
Total expenditure £177.71k £186.96k £215.00k £247.98k £261.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.50k £11.07k £3.55k N/A N/A