THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HAILSHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To spread the good news of Jesus to the church family and wider community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,356 from 1 government grant(s)
People

16 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- ST. MARY'S CHURCH, HAILSHAM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Rory Malise Graham | Chair | 01 September 2015 |
|
|||||
Derek William Cordrey | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Margaret McGregor Bell Coleman | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robin Keith Smith | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elizabeth Baird | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Paul Taylor | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roger Tipping | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Arthur Risbridger | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Cannon | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Denise Sinden | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Michael Saxby | Trustee | 13 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Gordon Canning | Trustee | 13 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Jeffery Sinden | Trustee | 23 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Margery Ann Luffingham | Trustee | 30 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Harry Garvican | Trustee | 30 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
Roger Kenneth Booth | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £268.40k | £265.13k | £271.73k | £247.67k | £234.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £316.47k | £736.39k | £434.00k | £401.90k | £339.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.81k | £1.84k | £1.84k | £2.10k | £2.36k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Vicarage Road
Hailsham
BN27 1BJ
- Phone:
- 01323442410
- Email:
- office@hailshamchurch.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window